Thursday, 4 May 2017

MATHS TRICK 3:- MULTIPLICATION OF NUMBER 11

Hello,

        Today, I am introducing you MATHS TRICKS 3:- MULTIPLICATION OF NUMBER 11. This trick help you for better maths.


Trick 3 : Multiply By 11

Multiplication of a number by 11

1234 x 11 = ?

The result of multiplication of a number by 11 is, 1234 x 11 = 13574.

We calculate this large number in shortcut way which minimize the time in exam hall.

Note: “Each digit add its Right-turn Number”

Step 1: Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 1234, ie, 4.

Step 2: Add the 4+3 = 7 (note down 7 to the left of 4) 74.

Step 3: Again Add 3+2 = 5 (note down 5 to the left of 7) 574.

Step 4: Again Add 2+1 = 3 (note down 3 to the left of 5) 3574.

Step 5: Lastly note down 1 to the left of number.

We get our final result that is 13574.

Another multiplication of a number by 11

2769 x 11 = ?

The result of multiplication of a number by 11 is, 2769 x 11 = 30459.

We calculate this large number in shortcut way which minimize the time in exam hall.

Note: “Each digit add its Right Turn Number”

Step 1: Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 2769, ie, 9.

Step 2: Add the 9+6 = 15 (note down 5 to the left of 9 and carry 1) 59.

Step 3: Again Add 7+6+1 (add carry) = 14 (note down 4 and carry 1) 459.

Step 4: Again Add 2+7+1 (add carry) = 10 (note down 0 and carry 1) 0459.

Step 5: Lastly Add carry 1 to the right most number 2+1 = 3 (note down the number ).

We get our final result that is 30459.

Another multiplication of a number by 11

The result of multiplication of a number by 11 is, 4739 x 11 = 52129.

We calculate this large number in shortcut way which minimize the time in exam hall.

Note: “Each digit add its Right Turn Number”

Step 1: Firstly we Write down the Right most number of 4739, ie, 9.

Step 2: Add the 9+3 = 12 (note down 2 to the left of 9 and carry 1) 29.

Step 3: Again Add 3+7+1 (add carry) = 11 (note down 1 and carry 1) 159.

Step 4: Again Add 7+4+1 (add carry) = 12 (note down 2 and carry 1) 2159.

Step 5: Lastly Add carry 1 to the right most number 4+1 = 5 (note down the number ).
We get our final result that is 52129.


NOTE:- If anyone have any questions or problems about this post please contact jigssolanki1995@gmail.com . jigssolanki.in taken this file from social media or other Internet websites


No comments: